Legere-Gordon v. FirstCredit Incorporated
Plaintiff: Naomi Legere-Gordon and Firstcredit Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00360
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Firstcredit Incorporated. (Hasson, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Firstcredit Incorporated.(Hasson, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Anthony I Paronich for Naomi Legere-Gordon. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Anthony I. Paronich. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1954651.)Eric B. Swartz appearing for Plaintiff Naomi Legere-Gordon. Responses due by 11/6/2019 (Swartz, Eric)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeffrey I. Hasson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1953908.)Jeffrey I Hasson appearing for Defendant Firstcredit Incorporated. Responses due by 11/5/2019 (Hasson, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The above-entitled case has been set for a scheduling conference, at 10:00 a.m. (MDT) on January 15, 2020, at the James A. McClure Federal Building and United States Courthouse in Boise, Idaho. (Courtroom to be determined.) A Joint Litigation Plan (attached hereto) must be filed fourteen (14) calendar days prior to the scheduling conference. Please read the attached Plan carefully as it differs in some respects from the District of Idahos standard litigation plan. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Litigation Plan)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 7, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #7 Notice of Appearance and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/6/2019. (ckh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Mayes Fawcett on behalf of Firstcredit Incorporated (Fawcett, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Shubb. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00360-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Naomi Legere-Gordon. Firstcredit Incorporated served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Swartz, Eric)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Gary M Klinger for Naomi Legere-Gordon. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Gary M. Klinger. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1942601.)Eric B. Swartz appearing for Plaintiff Naomi Legere-Gordon. Responses due by 10/11/2019 (Swartz, Eric)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Firstcredit Incorporated. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Naomi Legere-Gordon ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1941530.), filed by Naomi Legere-Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Swartz, Eric) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/19/2019 with a PDF that cannot be edited.) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legere-Gordon v. FirstCredit Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Legere-Gordon
Represented By: Eric B. Swartz
Represented By: Anthony I Paronich
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firstcredit Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?