Amaya v. Canyon County, State of Idaho
Plaintiff: Miguel G. Amaya
Defendant: Canyon County, State of Idaho
Case Number: 1:2019cv00362
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Canyon County, State of Idaho.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/15/2019.(Walrath, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Miguel G. Amaya. Replies due by 11/14/2019.(Gunn, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Jennifer Allen re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Canyon County, State of Idaho . (Walrath, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Jennifer M Walrath appearing for Defendant Canyon County, State of Idaho. Responses due by 10/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim)(Walrath, Jennifer)
October 7, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00362-NDF on all future pleadings. (st)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Nancy D Freudenthal from the District of Wyoming. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Walrath on behalf of Canyon County, State of Idaho (Walrath, Jennifer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA by Defendant Canyon County, State of Idaho re #2 Declaration of Pamela S. Howland. (Walrath, Jennifer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by Defendant Canyon County, State of Idaho re #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F)(Walrath, Jennifer)
September 20, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The docket entry numbers #1 Notice of Removal and #2 Declaration filed by Canyon County, State of Idaho were filed incorrectly in this case. Both the Notice of Removal and Declaration are missing all even page numbers. In addition, Canyon County, State of Idaho, failed to submit a Civil Cover Sheet as an attachment to the Notice of Removal. The filing party shall please re-submit its corrected filings as a separate Errata for each docket entry and shall link each Errata to the original docket entry. (ckh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Pamela S. Howland re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Canyon County, State of Idaho . (Walrath, Jennifer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Canyon County, State of Idaho from District Court of the Third Judicial District of The State of Idaho In and For the County of Canyon, case number CV14-19-02823.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1942349.), filed by Canyon County, State of Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Summons, #5 Exhibit E -- State Court Acceptance of Service)(Walrath, Jennifer) Modified on 9/20/2019 to add Exhibit descriptions (ckh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amaya v. Canyon County, State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel G. Amaya
Represented By: Eric S Rossman
Represented By: Erica S Phillips
Represented By: Matthew G Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon County, State of Idaho
Represented By: Pamela Simmons Howland
Represented By: Jennifer M Walrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?