The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC, The and The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00376
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Stipulation to Extend Time (Dkt. #13 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before December 16, 2019. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for December 11, 2019 is VACATED AND RESET for January 14, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Boise, Idaho. The parties' Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan are due on or before January 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. ((alw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 COVER LETTER REGARDING POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG ACTIONS TO MDL NO. 1869 by BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company (Attachments: #1 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Actions to MDL No. 1869 and Motion for Transfer, Consolidation, and/or Coordination of Rail Freight Fuel Surcharge Antitrust Actions, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Schedule of Actions)(jp) (Large Binder too voluminous to scan, located in clerk's office-jp).
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer by The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC. (Rauer, Portia)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint (Dkt. 11). Defendants have until on or before November 7, 2019 in which to file their response to the complaint. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extend Time to Answer Complaint by The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC. (Rauer, Portia)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #7 and #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Sami H Rashid, Stephen R Neuwirth for The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Union Pacific Railroad, #2 Norfolk Southern Railway, #3 CSX Transportation, Inc.)(Rauer, Portia)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephen R. Neuwirth. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1959387.)Portia L Rauer appearing for Plaintiff The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC. Responses due by 11/14/2019 (Rauer, Portia)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Sami H. Rashid. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1959379.)Portia L Rauer appearing for Plaintiff The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC. Responses due by 11/14/2019 (Rauer, Portia)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Thomas W Wilcox for The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2019 10:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before December 4, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Thomas W. Wilcox. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1955273.)Portia L Rauer appearing for Plaintiff The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC. Responses due by 11/7/2019 (Rauer, Portia)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons CSX, #2 Summons Norfolk Southern, #3 Summons Union Pacific)(alw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC, The identifying Corporate Parent Snake River Sugar Company for Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC, The.. (Rauer, Portia)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1946699.), filed by Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BNSF Railway Company, #3 Summons CSX Transportation, Inc., #4 Summons Norfolk Southern Railway Company, #5 Summons Union Pacific Railroad Company)(Rauer, Portia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC, The
Represented By: Portia L Rauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Amalgamated Sugar Company, LLC
Represented By: Portia L Rauer
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Raymond D Powers
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Thomas W Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?