Brookville Equipment Corporation v. MotivePower, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brookville Equipment Corporation
Defendant: MotivePower, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00387
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Dane Andrew Bolinger appearing for Defendant MotivePower, Inc.. Responses due by 12/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Daniel O'Donnell, #3 Exhibit A)(Bolinger, Dane)
November 13, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stephen Bough. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00387-SRB on all future pleadings. (st)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stephen R Bough from the Western District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MotivePower, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Wabtec Holding Corp., Other Affiliate Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies for MotivePower, Inc... (Bolinger, Dane)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Brookville Equipment Corporation and MotivePower, Inc. re #1 Complaint and #5 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/30/2019. (ckh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dane Andrew Bolinger on behalf of MotivePower, Inc. (Bolinger, Dane)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brookville Equipment Corporation. MotivePower, Inc. served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Grasham, Debora)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brookville Equipment Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Brookville Global Holdings, Inc. for Brookville Equipment Corporation.. (Grasham, Debora)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to MotivePower, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against MotivePower, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1949310.), filed by Brookville Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Grasham, Debora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brookville Equipment Corporation v. MotivePower, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MotivePower, Inc.
Represented By: Dane Andrew Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookville Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Debora Kristensen Grasham
Represented By: Kersti Harter Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?