Carey v. Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department et al
Plaintiff: James H Carey, Jr
Defendant: Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department, Kerri Anderson and Melissa Bishop
Case Number: 1:2019cv00401
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department, Kerri Anderson, Melissa Bishop. (Roscheck, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department, Kerri Anderson, Melissa Bishop, and James H Carey, Jr re #4 Answer to Complaint and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/24/2020. (ckh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department, Kerri Anderson, Melissa Bishop.(Roscheck, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James H Carey, Jr. Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Kerri Anderson served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Melissa Bishop served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed, #2 Summons Returned Executed)(Earl, Ryan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Anderson Summons, #2 Bishop Summons) (ckh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1954374.), filed by James H Carey, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department, #2 Summons K. Anderson, #3 Summons M. Bishop, #4 Cover Sheet)(Earl, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carey v. Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department
Represented By: Erica J. White
Represented By: David Aaron Roscheck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerri Anderson
Represented By: Erica J. White
Represented By: David Aaron Roscheck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Bishop
Represented By: Erica J. White
Represented By: David Aaron Roscheck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Carey, Jr
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?