The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. v. Savello, LLC
Plaintiff: The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.
Defendant: Savello, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00414
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum on Motion to Dismiss Count 2 of Counterclaim. (Doc. #18). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Plaintiff/Counterdefendant The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. is granted an extension of time until and including December 27, 2019, to file its reply. Signed by Judge Stephen R Bough. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (tld)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Bruce R McAllister appearing for Counter Defendant The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (McAllister, Bruce)
December 18, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF CASE NUMBER CHANGE. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stephen R Bough. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00414-SRB on all future pleadings. (st)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stephen R Bough from the Western District of Missouri. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 17, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal and Answer and Counterclaim filed by The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.. Replies due by 12/31/2019.(Lawson, Edward)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. Notice of Association as Counsel of Counter-defendant the Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. (McAllister, Bruce)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/11/2019.(Lawson, Edward)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Savello, LLC. Replies due by 12/19/2019.(Relf, Jack)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal and Answer and Counterclaim Jack Widener Relf appearing for Defendant Savello, LLC, Counter Claimant Savello, LLC. Responses due by 12/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Relf, Jack)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Savello, LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John C Hansen, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John C. Hansen, #3 Declaration of Katherine Vogeleheim, #4 Declaration of Robert Underwood)(Relf, Jack)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Edward A Lawson appearing for Plaintiff The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.. Responses due by 12/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Lawson, Edward)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING - Due to reassignment of this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/8/2020 11:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale and corresponding Litigation/Discovery Plan deadline of 1/2/2020 are hereby VACATED. (at)
November 5, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-00414-BLW. (jd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE. (jd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Edward A Lawson appearing for Counter Defendant The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc., Plaintiff The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.. Responses due by 11/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Lawson, Edward)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on January 8, 2020, at 11:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before January 2, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. by Savello, LLC.(Dvorak, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Savello, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Register of Action. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 State Court Service Documents)(Dvorak, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Savello, LLC and counsel for The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/24/2019. (jd)
October 25, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
October 25, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The state court documents were filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal and properly titled the document name. The filing party shall re-submit their exhibits as supplement and link them to the Notice of Removal. The answer that you attached to the Notice of Removal doesn't appear to have been filed in the state court, therefore it should have it's own docket entry and not be attached as an exhibit. Please refile the answer.(jd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Savello, LLC from Blaine County District Court, case number CV07-19-00571.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1959573.), filed by Savello, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Thomas E. Dvorak, #3 Exhibit to Dvorak Declaration, #4 Answer and Counterclaim)(Dvorak, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. v. Savello, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savello, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Dvorak
Represented By: Jack Widener Relf
Represented By: Thomas E Dvorak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Edward A Lawson
Represented By: Cody Lynn Morgan
Represented By: Katie Franklin
Represented By: Bruce R McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?