Hugunin v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Harvey William Hugunin
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00423
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from Harvey W. Hugunin. (ckh)
December 26, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from Harvey Hugunin(jp)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to set a Trial date in letter form by Plaintiff Harvey William Hugunin. Responses due by 1/8/2020. (jd)
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from Harvey Hugunin with attached letters to Judge BLW and DCN. (jd)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Harvey Hugunin. (jd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 Letter with attachments from Harvey Hugunin.(jd)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Harvey Hugunin. (jd)
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Reopen Case in letter form by Plaintiff Harvey William Hugunin. Responses due by 1/2/2020. (jd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Harvey Hugunin re: JP Morgan Chase Bank CEO contact info. (jd)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that that this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i-iii), without leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (docket no. #1 ) is DEEMED MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Clerk close this case. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Harvey Hugunin. (jd)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Harvey Hugunin, re: hand delivered checks. (jd)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Harvey Hugunin re: issuing a check from JP Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(jd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Harvey Hugunin re: post office visit. (Attachments: #1 Letter from DVA)(jd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Harvey Hugunin re: J.P. Morgan bank. (jd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Harvey Hugunin requesting that all mail not be delivered to the General Delivery Box at the Post Office. Mr. Hugunin will come to the courthouse to pick up any mail. (jd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Harvey Hugunin re: getting mail at post office. (jd)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Harvey Hugunin re: post office incident. (jd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harvey William Hugunin. (Address has been updated). (jd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Harvey Hugunin. (No forwarding address located). (jd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Harvey Hugunin. (jd)
November 1, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-00423-BLW. (jd)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by Harvey William Hugunin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(kt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harvey William Hugunin. Responses due by 11/20/2019 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hugunin v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey William Hugunin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?