Maine Community Health Options v. Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maine Community Health Options
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00448
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION Motion to Enforce Third-Party Arbitration Subpoena filed by Maine Community Health Options.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/31/2019.(Lewis, Brian)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 SECOND RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Stephen J. McBrady, Jacinta Alves, Laurel Pyke Malson re: 9 Order Reassigning Case, (Attachments: #1 returned mail, #2 returned mail)(jp)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Enforce Third-Party Arbitration Subpoena filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc.. Replies due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel S. Day, #2 Declaration of Paul Page)(Prince, Jason)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN MAIL as to Stephen J. McBrady, Brian C. Lewis, Jacinta L. Alves,& Laurel Pyke Malson. (Attachments: #1 Returned Mail, #2 Returned Mail, #3 Returned Mail)(jp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maine Community Health Options. Albertsons Companies, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (McLaughlin, Alexander)
November 26, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge James Moody. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00448-JMM on all future pleadings. (st)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge James M. Moody from the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Albertsons Companies, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #3 , #4 , #5 , & #6 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Brian C Lewis, Stephen J McBrady, Laurel Pyke Malson, and Jacinta L Alves for Maine Community Health Options. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brian C. Lewis. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1971973.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Plaintiff Maine Community Health Options. Responses due by 12/11/2019 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephen J. McBrady. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1971966.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Plaintiff Maine Community Health Options. Responses due by 12/11/2019 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Laurel Pyke Malson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1971962.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Plaintiff Maine Community Health Options. Responses due by 12/11/2019 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jacinta L. Alves. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1971953.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Plaintiff Maine Community Health Options. Responses due by 12/11/2019 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maine Community Health Options. (McLaughlin, Alexander)
November 20, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Maine Community Health Options was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-submit their Corporate Disclosure Statement (using "Corporate Disclosure Statement" located under Other Documents) and the Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice (using "Motion" and relief type "Pro Hac Vice Appearance) as separate docket entries.(jp)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION Motion to Enforce Third-Party Arbitration Subpoena against Albertsons Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1971814.), filed by Maine Community Health Options. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Enforce Third-Party Subpoena, #3 Declaration of Jacinta L Alves in Support of Motion to Enforce Third-Party Subpoena, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Jacinta L Alves], #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Laurel Pyke Malson], #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Stephen J McBrady], #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Brian C Lewis])(McLaughlin, Alexander) Modified on 12/16/2019, to change from Complaint to Motion (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maine Community Health Options v. Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maine Community Health Options
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Laurel Pyke Malson
Represented By: Jacinta L Alves
Represented By: Stephen J McBrady
Represented By: Brian C. Lewis
Represented By: Melodie Annalise McQuade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Emerson Prince
Represented By: Jennifer M Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?