Jones v. James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Milton Stewart Jones
Defendant: James River Insurance Company and Does I-V
Case Number: 1:2019cv00454
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) - All dispositive motions shall be filed by November 1, 2020. All motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, shall be filed on or before April 1, 2020. ADR must be held SCHEDULING ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) - All dispositive motions shall be filed by November 1, 2020. All motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, shall be filed on or before April 1, 2020. ADR must be held by September 15, 2020. All factual discovery will be completed by October 1, 2020. The case shall be deemed ready for jury trial as of November 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul A Magnuson. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addreby September 15, 2020. All factual discovery will be completed by October 1, 2020. The case shall be deemed ready for jury trial as of November 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul A Magnuson. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) (Main Document 10 replaced on 1/17/2020) (jd).sses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) (Main Document 10 replaced on 1/17/2020, because the original order had the incorrect case number on it. (jd)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 DISCOVERY PLAN by Milton Stewart Jones re #8 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan . (Hanby, Michael)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Milton Stewart Jones. (Hanby, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, January 16, 2020, at 09:00 AM Mountain (10:00 AM Central), for purpose of discussing the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (651) 848-1150 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before January 14, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Entered by Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (alt)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 DEFENDANT JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER to Complaint by James River Insurance Company.(Crow, Jennifer)
December 19, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Magnuson. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00454-PAM on all future pleadings. (st)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Paul A Magnuson from the District of Minnesota. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for James River Insurance Company and counsel for Milton Stewart Jones re #3 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/21/2020. (jd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District of the State of Idaho Ada County, case number CV01-19-08241.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1973697.) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint #2 State court docket #3 Confidential Case information sheet #4 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Crow #5 Exhibit A to Declaration, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crow, Jennifer) Modified on 11/25/2019 (jd).
November 22, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James River Insurance Company was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal. Please file the state court documents as errata and link it to the Notice of Removal. Also please file a civil cover sheet form JS44, use the civil cover sheet event.(jd)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James River Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate James River Group Holdings, Ltd. for James River Insurance Company.. (Crow, Jennifer)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fourth Judicial District of the State of Idaho Ada County, case number CV01-19-08241.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1972897.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Crow, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Stewart Jones
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer L Crow
Represented By: Mark Preston Scheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?