United States of America v. Oprins
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Nichole Oprins
Case Number: 1:2019cv00474
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF LITIGATION PLAN AND DISCOVERY PLAN NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Stipulated Proposed litigation and discovery plans must be filed on or before FEBRUARY 14,2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2020 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for USA and to Nicole Oprins re #1 Complaint and #4 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/21/2020. (jd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Nichole Oprins.(jd)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Nichole Oprins served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Firpo, Robert)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nichole Oprins. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nichole Oprins, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Summons, #9 Cover Sheet)(Firpo, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Oprins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Oprins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Burke Firpo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?