White v. Oxarc, Inc.
Plaintiff: Derrick W. White
Defendant: Oxarc, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00485
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-485-BLW (alw)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(alw)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial by Oxarc, Inc..(Gans, Jaclyn)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oxarc, Inc.. (Gans, Jaclyn)
January 9, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Oxarc, Inc. and Derrick W. White re #4 Notice of Appearance and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/9/2020. (ckh)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Walters on behalf of Oxarc, Inc. (Walters, Matthew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derrick W. White. Oxarc, Inc. served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Perkins, Angela)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Oxarc, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oxarc, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1980553.), filed by Derrick W. White. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil, #2 Summons)(Perkins, Angela) Modified on 12/9/2019 to correct name of party against whom Complaint was filed (ckh). Modified on 12/11/2019 to remove duplicate language (alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Oxarc, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxarc, Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn Terese Gans
Represented By: Matthew L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick W. White
Represented By: Angela Dawn Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?