Fries v. Saul
Plaintiff: James Leroy Fries
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00486
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joanne P Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Joanne)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for James Leroy Fries and Andrew Saul re #6 Notice of Appearance and #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/17/2020. (ckh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Bennett Watson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Watson, Katherine)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Leroy Fries re #1 Petition for Review, #3 Summons Issued as to USA , AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by James Leroy Fries., SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Leroy Fries. SSA served on 12/23/2019, answer due 3/23/2020; Andrew Saul served on 12/23/2019, answer due 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Confirmation)(Harper, Barbara)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by James Leroy Fries This is a sealed document.. (Mossman-Fletcher, Taylor)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1981163.), filed by James Leroy Fries. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Mossman-Fletcher, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fries v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Leroy Fries
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Represented By: Taylor Lynn Mossman-Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?