Hugunin v. United States of America Social Security Trust Fund
Plaintiff: Harvey William Hugunin
Defendant: United States of America Social Security Trust Fund
Case Number: 1:2019cv00493
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harvey William Hugunin. Address has been updated. (jd)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Harvey W. Hugunin. (ckh)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States of America Social Security Trust Fund, filed by Harvey William Hugunin.(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2019: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Termination of Premium Hospital and/or Supplementary Medical Insurance) (kt).
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harvey William Hugunin. Responses due by 1/2/2020 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hugunin v. United States of America Social Security Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Social Security Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey William Hugunin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?