Hillen v. Burke Electric Inc
Plaintiff: Noah G Hillen
Defendant: Burke Electric Inc
In Re: Farmers Grain LLC
Case Number: 1:2019mc10526
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:157
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET SHEET for Adversary Proceeding 19-06016-TLM. (jp)
August 26, 2019 RECEIPT: Fee Received in Adversary case $ 181, receipt # 7179527 (jp)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 TRUSTEE'S Objection to Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial, and Motion to Strike, re #2 MOTION for Trial filed by Noah G Hillen. (Dkt 18 in Adversary 19-6016) Replies due by 9/4/2019.(jp)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION and Memorandum in Support of Demand for Trial by Jury. (Dkt 16 in Adversary 19-06016-TLM)Patrick John Geile appearing for Defendant Burke Electric Inc. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (jp)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION & Memorandum to Withdraw Reference. Patrick John Geile appearing for Defendant Burke Electric Inc. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillen v. Burke Electric Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burke Electric Inc
Represented By: Patrick John Geile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah G Hillen
Represented By: Jed W Manwaring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Farmers Grain LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?