Bruce v. The TJX Companies, Inc
Plaintiff: Lindarose Curtis Bruce and The TJX Companies, Inc. dba T.J. Maxx
Defendant: John Does I-X and The TJX Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00007
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William M Fontenot on behalf of Lindarose Curtis Bruce (Fontenot, William)
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with the parties on August 3, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Mountain Time. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2020. Discovery due by 9/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/3/2020. ADR shall take place by 11/3/2020. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
February 3, 2020 Filing 14 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W. Dale: Appearance by Tim Gresback for the Plaintiff; Michael Ford for the Defendant. Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/3/2020. Court noted Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans were filed in this matter. Parties agree to participate in mediation on or before 11/3/2020. Consent process discussed. Telephonic Status Conference to be set in August 2020, with specific date/time to be included in forthcoming Scheduling Order. Time in Court 11:38-11:45 AM. (Hearing not recorded.) (at)
January 30, 2020 Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney William M Fontenot for Lindarose Curtis Bruce Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Ford, Michael)
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN by The TJX Companies, Inc. . (Ford, Michael)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 ERRATA by Plaintiff Lindarose Curtis Bruce re #9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by William Fontenot. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1997035.) . (Gresback, Tim)
January 17, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - re #9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by William Fontenot. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1997035.) filed by Lindarose Curtis Bruce, was not filed using the correct form. Please use form: Pro Hac Vice located on the courts webpage. When filing the form in CM/ECF use event "errata" and link the form back to your original motion (Dkt. 9). Do NOT file as a motion otherwise you will be charged again. (jd)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by William Fontenot. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1997035.)Tim Gresback appearing for Plaintiff Lindarose Curtis Bruce. Responses due by 2/6/2020 (Gresback, Tim)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Unless the Plaintiff contacts Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on February 3, 2020, at 11:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9945 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before January 27, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Ford, Michael)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by The TJX Companies, Inc..(Janicki, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant The TJX Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Docket. (Janicki, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant The TJX Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Janicki, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Lindarose Curtis Bruce and The TJX Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/9/2020. (ckh)
January 7, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
January 7, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The TJX Companies, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case. The state court docket and the federal civil cover sheet should also have been attached to the Notice of Removal. Please submit those two documents, individually named, as Supplements linked to the Notice of Removal (to avoid being charged again). (ckh)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lloyd Ford on behalf of The TJX Companies, Inc. dba T.J. Maxx (Ford, Michael)
January 6, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED. (ckh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The TJX Companies, Inc. dba T.J. Maxx from Fourth District Court of Ada County, case number CV01-19-16010.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1990848.), filed by The TJX Companies, Inc. dba T.J. Maxx. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service)(Janicki, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. The TJX Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindarose Curtis Bruce
Represented By: William M Fontenot
Represented By: Tim Gresback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The TJX Companies, Inc. dba T.J. Maxx
Represented By: Robert L Janicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The TJX Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Janicki
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?