Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC et al v. Escobar et al
Plaintiff: Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC
Defendant: Neudesign Architecture, LLC, Holley Dryden, Infinity & Roberts, LLC, James L Escobar, Marla Carson, Tyler Roberts, Does 1-5, ABC Companies 1-5 and Jonathan Klutnick
Case Number: 1:2020cv00012
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Hodson on behalf of Marla Carson, James L Escobar, Neudesign Architecture, LLC (Hodson, Alexandra)
February 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Cuneo on behalf of Marla Carson, James L Escobar, Neudesign Architecture, LLC (Cuneo, Christopher)
February 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Marla Carson, James L Escobar and Neudesign Architecture, LLC re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/20/2020. (ckh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neudesign Architecture, LLC. (Stott, Jordan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Jordan Lee Stott appearing for Defendants Marla Carson, James L Escobar, Neudesign Architecture, LLC. Responses due by 3/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stott, Jordan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Holley Dryden, Infinity & Roberts, LLC, Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC, Tyler Roberts re #1 Complaint, #15 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/13/2020. (ckh)
February 12, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Infinity & Roberts, LLC. (Johnson, Wyatt)
February 12, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Holley Dryden, Infinity & Roberts, LLC, Tyler Roberts.(Johnson, Wyatt)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Klutnick. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 Amended Complaint to add party #12 Amended Complaint Brian A Laird appearing for Plaintiff Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. Responses due by 3/2/2020 (Laird, Brian) Modified on 2/10/2020 to edit docket text (alw).
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Laird, Brian)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. Tyler Roberts served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Laird, Brian)
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. Neudesign Architecture, LLC served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Laird, Brian)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. Marla Carson served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Laird, Brian)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. James L Escobar served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Laird, Brian)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. Holley Dryden served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Laird, Brian)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. Infinity & Roberts, LLC served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. (Laird, Brian)
January 27, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #5 Certificate of Service filed by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC was filed using the incorrect docket event. The filing party shall re-submit their filing using "Summons Returned Executed" located under Responses and Replies so the answer due date is generated.(jp)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC (Laird, Brian)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. (Laird, Brian)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marla Carson, Holley Dryden, James L Escobar, Infinity & Roberts, LLC, Neudesign Architecture, LLC, and Tyler Roberts. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Carson Summons, #2 Dryden Summons, #3 Infinity & Roberts Summons, #4 Nuedesign Architecture Summons, #5 Roberts Summons) (ckh)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action (Notice sent to USPTO). (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachments) (ckh)
January 8, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed separately using the Corporate Disclosure Statement event located under Civil Events/Other Filings/Other Documents rather than being attached to the Complaint. Please re-file using the correct event. (ckh)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1991697.), filed by Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons Summons - Carson, #4 Summons Summons - Dryden, #5 Summons Summons - Escobar, #6 Summons Summons - Infinity, #7 Summons Summons - Neudesign, #8 Summons Summons - Roberts, #9 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Laird, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC et al v. Escobar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neudesign Architecture, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Cuneo
Represented By: Jordan Lee Stott
Represented By: Alexandra Hodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holley Dryden
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity & Roberts, LLC
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Escobar
Represented By: Christopher J Cuneo
Represented By: Jordan Lee Stott
Represented By: Alexandra Hodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla Carson
Represented By: Christopher J Cuneo
Represented By: Jordan Lee Stott
Represented By: Alexandra Hodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Roberts
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Klutnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Platform Architecture & Design, PLLC
Represented By: Brian A Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?