Probst v. Adams County Sheriff Department et al
Plaintiff: Julia Vance Probst
Defendant: Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, St. Lukes, United States Postal Service, Adams County Sheriff Department and Valley County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00032
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Julia Vance Probst re #2 Complaint. (ckh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2020: #1 Envelope) (ckh).
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Julia Vance Probst. Responses due by 3/18/2020. (ckh)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for violation of Civil Rights against Adams County Sheriff Department, Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, St. Lukes, United States Postal Service, Valley County Sheriff Department, filed by Julia Vance Probst. (Attachments: #1 Petition to the United States Court)(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2020: #2 Cover Letter) (kt).
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Julia Vance Probst. Responses due by 2/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Additional information)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Probst v. Adams County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Department of Health and Welfare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Lukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Vance Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?