Brown v. Diamond Line Delivery Systems Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael E Brown
Defendant: Diamond Line Delivery Systems Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00033
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
February 24, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Michael E Brown, and counsel for Diamond Line Delivery Systems Inc. re #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/24/2020. (jd)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Diamond Line Delivery Systems Inc..(White, Robert)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Summons and Complaint by Michael E Brown. (Coulter, Ronaldo)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Declaration of Process Server served on Johnny Elliott on 1/24/2020, filed by Michael E Brown. (Coulter, Ronaldo)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before March 24, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2020 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Diamond Line Delivery Systems Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diamond Line Delivery Systems Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1998016.), filed by Michael E Brown. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Coulter, Ronaldo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Diamond Line Delivery Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Brown
Represented By: Ronaldo Arthur Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Line Delivery Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?