Hagan v. Action Collection Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hagan
Defendant: Peak Law, LLC and Action Collection Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00090
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
2 Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Peak Law, LLC.(Geile, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman from the District of Wyoming. Signed by Judge Nancy D Freudenthal. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING PRIOR HEARINGS AND DEADLINES AND SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. IT IS ORDERED THAT all deadlines and hearings set prior to this reassignment are HEREBY VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, at least 7 days prior to the pretrial conference, the parties shall file a joint case management plan. (Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Nancy D Freudenthal.). Signed by Judge Nancy D Freudenthal. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 23, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Freudenthal. Please use case number 1:2-cv-00090-NDF on all future pleadings. (st)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Nancy D Freudenthal from the District of Wyoming. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney James A Sellers, II for Michael Hagan. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peak Law, LLC. (Geile, Patrick)
March 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James A. Sellers, II. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2026954.)Barkley Bissell Smith appearing for Plaintiff Michael Hagan. Responses due by 4/8/2020 (Smith, Barkley)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts my Judicial Assistant, Amy Beers, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on May 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. mountain time, (Boise chambers) for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9022 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before May 4, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 13, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Action Collection Service, Inc.. (Hasson, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Action Collection Service, Inc..(Hasson, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Complaint, #8 Notice of Appearance and #9 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/12/2020. (ckh)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick John Geile on behalf of Peak Law, LLC (Geile, Patrick)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Mayes Fawcett on behalf of Action Collection Service, Inc. (Fawcett, Ryan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeffrey I. Hasson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2023998.)Jeffrey I Hasson appearing for Defendant Action Collection Service, Inc.. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Hasson, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Miley Thomas on February 27, 2020, filed by Michael Hagan. (Smith, Barkley)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Brent D. Harris on February 27, 2020, filed by Michael Hagan. (Smith, Barkley)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Peak Law Summons) (ckh)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by Plaintiff Michael Hagan re #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Smith, Barkley)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2015237.), filed by Michael Hagan. (Attachments: #1 Summons Peak Law, LLC, #2 Summons Action Collections Service, INC, #3 Cover Sheet)(Smith, Barkley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagan v. Action Collection Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Law, LLC
Represented By: Patrick John Geile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Collection Service, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey I Hasson
Represented By: Ryan Mayes Fawcett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hagan
Represented By: Barkley Bissell Smith
Represented By: James A Sellers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?