Agri Beef Co. v. Corra Technology Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Corra Technology and Agri Beef Co.
Defendant: Ron Bongo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00093
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Corra Technology)(jd)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corra Technology, Ron Bongo, filed by Agri Beef Co.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended - Corra, #2 Summons Bongo)(Hancock, Nicole)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Agri Beef Co.. (Hancock, Nicole)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Nicole C Hancock for Agri Beef Co. added. Attorney Christopher C McCurdy and Jason Emerson Prince terminated. Request to Turn Electronic Noticing OFF (no longer receive NEFs in this case only) by Attorney (Hancock, Nicole)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Corra Technology. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Agri Beef Co. identifying Corporate Parent Agri Beef Co. for Agri Beef Co... (Prince, Jason)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corra Technology ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2015893.), filed by Agri Beef Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Prince, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agri Beef Co. v. Corra Technology Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corra Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agri Beef Co.
Represented By: Jason Emerson Prince
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Represented By: Nicole C Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Bongo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?