BrianLou LLC v. Ruplinger et al
Plaintiff: BrianLou LLC
Defendant: Todd Ruplinger, TRUP Holdings LLC and Adriana Ruplinger
Case Number: 1:2020cv00097
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 ERRATA by Plaintiff BrianLou LLC re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . (Hancock, Nicole)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BrianLou LLC (Hancock, Nicole)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Mary E Flynn for BrianLou LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Mary E. Flynn. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2024196.)Nicole C Hancock appearing for Plaintiff BrianLou LLC. Responses due by 4/1/2020 (Hancock, Nicole)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BrianLou LLC. TRUP Holdings LLC served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Hancock, Nicole)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BrianLou LLC. Adriana Ruplinger served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Hancock, Nicole)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BrianLou LLC. Todd Ruplinger served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Hancock, Nicole)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BrianLou LLC. (Hancock, Nicole)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adriana Ruplinger, Todd Ruplinger, TRUP Holdings LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2016849.), filed by BrianLou LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Summons to Todd Ruplinger, #5 Summons to Adriana Ruplinger, #6 Summons to TRUP Holdings LLC, #7 Cover Sheet)(Hancock, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BrianLou LLC v. Ruplinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ruplinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUP Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Ruplinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BrianLou LLC
Represented By: James C Dale
Represented By: Nicole C Hancock
Represented By: Mary E Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?