Ferrari v. Zimmer US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lee W. Ferrari
Defendant: Biomet, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, John Does 1-10, Zimmer US, Inc. and Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00101
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Lee W. Ferrari, Zimmer US, Inc. re #1 Complaint and #4 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/22/2020. (ckh)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. for Zimmer US, Inc.; Corporate Parent LVB Acquisition, Inc. for Biomet, Inc.; Corporate Parent Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC for Biomet Orthopedics, LLC. (Ritchie, Benjamin)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc..(Ritchie, Benjamin)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee W. Ferrari. Zimmer US, Inc. served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (Bower, Daniel)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Biomet Manufacturing, Inc. Summons, #2 Biomet Orthopedics, LLC Summons, #3 Zimmer US, Inc. Summons) (ckh)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2018379.), filed by Lee W. Ferrari. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Biomet Manufacturing, #3 Summons Summons - Biomet Ortho, #4 Summons Summons - Biomet, #5 Summons Summons - Zimmer US)(Bower, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrari v. Zimmer US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Craig Ritchie
Represented By: Andrea J Rosholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Craig Ritchie
Represented By: Andrea J Rosholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Craig Ritchie
Represented By: Andrea J Rosholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Craig Ritchie
Represented By: Andrea J Rosholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee W. Ferrari
Represented By: Daniel W Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?