Savage v. Savage
Appellee: Mark Savage
Appellant: Colette Clair Savage
Case Number: 1:2020cv00120
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 Objection to Final Order, Response to Dismissal/Disposal of Legitimate Appeal, Request to transfer out of state to Pasadena Appellate Bankruptcy Court re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for mootness filed by Colette Clair Savage. Replies due by 5/11/2020. (ckh)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for mootness (ckh)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support by Derrick J. O'Neill re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for mootness filed by Mark Savage.(O'Neill, Derrick)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for mootness filed by Mark Savage.(O'Neill, Derrick)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for mootness Derrick J O'Neill appearing for Appellee Mark Savage. Responses due by 5/8/2020 (O'Neill, Derrick)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Colette Clair Savage. IT IS ORDERED that Appellant's Motion to Transfer this appeal to the BAP (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency Motion Staying the Bond Under Bank of Marin During Appeal, Stay Bankruptcy Title 13 Due to Dispute by Appellant Colette Clair Savage. Responses due by 4/20/2020. (ckh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Colette Savage. (ckh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Mark Savage. Replies due by 3/31/2020.(O'Neill, Derrick)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer to Bankruptcy Appellate Court by Appellant Colette Clair Savage. Responses due by 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grouping 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit Grouping 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit Grouping 3 of 3) (ckh)
March 6, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management deadline set for 4/5/2020. (ckh)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Appeal by Colette Clair Savage. (ckh)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-01462-JMM. File received (Notice sent to BK Judge, DJ and KL), filed by Colette Clair Savage. (Attachments: #1 BAP Docket, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Appeal, #4 Exhibits re Notice of Appeal, #5 BAP Opening Letter, #6 BAP Briefing Order, #7 BAP Status Request, #8 Appellee's Statement of Election to DC) (ckh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2020: #9 General Order 38) (ckh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savage v. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark Savage
Represented By: Derrick J O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Colette Clair Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?