Galloway v. Boise City Ada County Housing Authorities et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Galloway
Defendant: Boise City Ada County Housing Authorities, City of Boise and Ada County
Case Number: 1:2020cv00136
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FOR ADA COUNTY AND CITY OF BOISE. Defendants Ada County and City of Boise are HEREBY DISMISSED from this action, WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ORDER finding as moot, the Motions To Dismiss (Dkt. 6, 9) pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal (Dkt. 14). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 consent, #2 consent, #3 consent)(alw)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim In Non-Opposition filed by Sharon Galloway. Replies due by 5/19/2020.(Hepworth, J.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ada County and City of Boise by Sharon Galloway. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Judgment of Dismissal)(Hepworth, J.)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for City of Boise re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/15/2020. (alw)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mary R. Grant appearing for Defendant City of Boise. Responses due by 5/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jamie Heinzerling, #2 Declaration of Christine Starr, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Grant, Mary)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ada County, Boise City Ada County Housing Authorities, Sharon Galloway re #1 Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint, #6 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/15/2020. (alw)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand For Jury Trial by Boise City Ada County Housing Authorities.(Bailey, John) Modified on 4/13/2020 to correctly indicate the party represented & regenerate the NEF (jp).
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Catherine Ann Freeman appearing for Defendant Ada County. Responses due by 5/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Ada County's Motion to Dismiss)(Freeman, Catherine)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before May 28, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sharon Galloway Declaration of Service - County of Ada, State of Idaho (Hepworth, J.)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sharon Galloway Declaration of Service - Boise City - Ada County Housing Authorities (Hepworth, J.)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2025994.), filed by Sharon Galloway. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hepworth, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Boise City Ada County Housing Authorities et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise City Ada County Housing Authorities
Represented By: Julian E Gabiola
Represented By: John A Bailey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boise
Represented By: Mary R. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County
Represented By: Catherine Ann Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Galloway
Represented By: J. Grady Hepworth
Represented By: Jeffrey J Hepworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?