Robbertse v. USA
Petitioner: Gloudina Maria Robbertse
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00139
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and For Order Granting A Waiver Of The Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Gloudina Maria Robbertse. Replies due by 4/28/2020.(jd)
April 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION to Seal. Responses due by 7/10/2020. (jd)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING A WAIVER OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AND EXTENSION OF TIME - The Governments Motion for Order Granting a Waiver of the Attorney-ClientPrivilege and Extension of Time, filed March 31, 2020, 1:20-cv-00139-S-DCN(ECF #4 ) is GRANTED. The attorney-client privilege between Petitioner and attorneys Melissa Winberg and Thomas Monaghan is WAIVED as to each of the attributions of ineffective assistance named in Petitioners Motion. The United States shall file a written response to the Petitioners Motion withinninety (90) days from the date of this Order. The Petitioner shall have thirty(30) days thereafter to file any reply brief. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and For Order Granting A Waiver Of The Attorney-Client Privilege Heather Patricco appearing for Respondent USA. Responses due by 4/21/2020 (Patricco, Heather)
March 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION. Responses due by 4/20/2020. (jd)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - The United States shall file a written response to the Petitioners motion within thirty (30) days from the date of this scheduling order. The Petitioner shall have fourteen (14) days thereafter to file any reply brief. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) ( Criminal Action 1:18-cr-00281-DCN) filed by Gloudina Maria Robbertse. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) (ckh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 Motion to File 28 U.S.C. 2255 Under Seal and Motion for Post Conviction Discoveryby Petitioner Gloudina Maria Robbertse. Responses due by 4/9/2020. (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbertse v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Heather Patricco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gloudina Maria Robbertse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?