Zerr v. Hanks
Plaintiff: David M. Zerr
Defendant: Tom Hanks
Case Number: 1:2020cv00149
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to David M. Zerr. (Inmate no longer in custody) (jd)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #7 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff has 28 days to (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee, or (2) submit a trust account statement as described above. If Plaintiff does neither, this case may be dismissedwithout further notice. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal if he no longer intends to pursue this case. In that event, no filing fee will be due. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00864. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 25, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the District of Idaho. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Transfer by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, ***Civil Case Terminated. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David M. Zerr. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David M. Zerr. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Tom Hanks. Filed byDavid M. Zerr. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope 1, #3 Envelope 2)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 Letter of inquiry dated 3/6/20 from David M. Zerr re status of action. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/16/2020. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 3/16/2020. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 LETTER dated 1/30/2020 from David Zerr. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zerr v. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Zerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?