Montes v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Moises Montes
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company and Does I-V
Case Number: 1:2020cv00150
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. The parties, having filed a Joint Motion and Stipulation, the Court having reviewed the same, and good cause appearing therefor; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint be, and the same is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Michael G Brady appearing for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (Brady, Michael)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Replies due by 5/6/2020.(Brady, Michael)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support by Bryan S Storer re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Confirming Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Moises Montes.(Storer, Bryan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Bryan Scott Storer appearing for Plaintiff Moises Montes. Responses due by 5/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Storer, Bryan)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Brady, Michael)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Moises Montes and Progressive Direct Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/26/2020. (ckh)
March 27, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Progressive Direct Insurance Company served on 3/25/2020. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ckh)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Direct Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Direct Insurance Company.. (Brady, Michael)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ada County District, case number CV01-20-03712.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2030365.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Service of Summons, #2 Supplement Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Supplement State Court Docket Sheet)(Brady, Michael)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts my Judicial Assistant, Amy Beers, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on June 1, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. mountain time, (Boise chambers) for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9022 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before May 26, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 26, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents should be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal without declarations. The filing party shall please re-submit the state court docket sheet, complaint and service documents using the Supplement event and linking it to the #1 Notice of Removal with each document separately attached and named to reflect the nature of the document attached. (ckh)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Direct Insurance Company from Ada County District, case number CV01-20-03712.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2029964.), filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Michael G. Brady, #3 Declaration of Jeffrey M. May, #4 Declaration of Richard H. Greener)(Brady, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montes v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael G Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Montes
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Steen, III
Represented By: Bryan Scott Storer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?