McKenna v. Logo Carriers, LLC
Plaintiff: Tammy L. McKenna
Defendant: Logo Carriers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00156
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Logo Carriers, LLC Withdrawal of Counsel (Sperry, Willard)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Logo Carriers, LLC. (Sperry, Willard)
April 28, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Logo Carriers, LLC, Tammy L. McKenna re #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/29/2020. (alw)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Logo Carriers, LLC.(Sperry, Willard)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard E Sperry on behalf of Logo Carriers, LLC (Sperry, Willard)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Logo Carriers, LLC.(Arkoosh, Charles)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Logo Carriers, LLC (Arkoosh, Charles)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy L. McKenna. Logo Carriers, LLC served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (Hawkins, Boyd)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Logo Carriers, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tammy L. McKenna ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2030404.), filed by Tammy L. McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Hawkins, Boyd) Modified on 3/27/2020 to remove duplicate language in attachments (alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenna v. Logo Carriers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logo Carriers, LLC
Represented By: Willard E Sperry
Represented By: Charles Thomas Arkoosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy L. McKenna
Represented By: Boyd J Hawkins
Represented By: Boyd J. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?