Berg v. City of Boise Police Department, et al.
Plaintiff: City of Boise and Sierrna Berg
Defendant: City of Boise Police Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00164
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by City of Boise. (Muir, Scott)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 DISCOVERY PLAN by City of Boise . (Muir, Scott)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Sierrna Berg and to counsel for City of Boise and the City of Boise Police Department re #1 Complaint and #7 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/26/2020. (jd)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Boise, City of Boise Police Department.(Grant, Mary)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sierrna Berg Acceptance of Service - City of Boise Police Department (Hepworth, J.)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sierrna Berg Acceptance of Service - City of Boise (Hepworth, J.)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before May 28, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 09:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before April 29, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 09:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Police Department)(jd)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2032583.), filed by Sierrna Berg. (Attachments: #1 Summons City of Boise Police Department, #2 Summons City of Boise, #3 Cover Sheet)(Hepworth, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. City of Boise Police Department, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boise Police Department
Represented By: Mary R. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Boise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierrna Berg
Represented By: J. Grady Hepworth
Represented By: Jeffrey J Hepworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?