Bymun v. City of Kimberly
Plaintiff: Roxanne Bymun
Defendant: City of Kimberly
Case Number: 1:2020cv00171
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER (STANDARD TRACK). IT IS SO ORDERED that telephonic scheduling conference on June 22, 2020 is VACATED. The following deadlines and procedures will govern this litigation: All dispositive motions shall be filed by March 26,2021. All motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, shall be filed on or before September 22, 2020. All factual discovery will be completed by February 24, 2021. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Kimberly.(Castleton, Bruce)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 DISCOVERY PLAN by City of Kimberly re #4 Litigation Order,,, . (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Litigation Plan)(Castleton, Bruce)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE RESETTING HEARING: Due to a conflict with counsel's schedule, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2020 at 9:30 AM is VACATED and rescheduled for 6/22/2020 at 11:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. The Litigation Plan, and Discovery Plan are due on or before 6/15/2020. (ab)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts my Judicial Assistant, Amy Beers, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on June 15, 2020, at 9:30 am mountain time, (Boise chambers) for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-1022 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before June 8, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Roxanne Bymun and City of Kimberly re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/8/2020. (ckh)
April 8, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - City of Kimberly served on 4/8/2020. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ckh)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by City of Kimberly re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal (Castleton, Bruce)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Kimberly from Twin Falls County, case number CV42-20-1177.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2034409.), filed by City of Kimberly. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 State Summons, #3 State Notice of Appearance, #4 State Affidavit of Service, #5 State Docket Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet)(Castleton, Bruce) Modified on 4/9/2020 to correct attachment names (ckh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bymun v. City of Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kimberly
Represented By: Landon Scott Brown
Represented By: Bruce J Castleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Bymun
Represented By: Kyle Eric Bastian
Represented By: Brooke Baldwin Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?