Torres-Donkersloot v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Amanda Kim Torres-Donkersloot
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00190
Filed: April 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 26311 (ckh)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING IFP APPLICATION. Petitioners In Forma PauperisApplication (Dkt. #2 ) is DENIED. Petitioner will be required to pay the filing fee by June 22, 2020 or this case may be dismissed. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Amanda Kim Torres-Donkersloot re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/12/2020. (ckh)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing (ckh)
April 18, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Amanda Kim Torres-Donkersloot This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)
April 18, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Brad D Parkinson appearing for Petitioner Amanda Kim Torres-Donkersloot. Responses due by 5/11/2020 (Parkinson, Brad)
April 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Amanda Kim Torres-Donkersloot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Parkinson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres-Donkersloot v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amanda Kim Torres-Donkersloot
Represented By: Brad D Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?