King v. Darigold, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zackery King
Defendant: Darigold, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00224
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - All discovery, including fact and expert discovery and depositions for preservation of testimony, is left open, save and except that it shall be so conducted as to be completed by March 12, 2021. All motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed on or before May 21, 2021. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for July 21, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. (MST). A jury trial is set for September 15, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. (MST). The parties shall file an ADRplan with Emily Donnellan no later than August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Zackery King. (Brown, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Dexter J. Pearce for Darigold, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Dexter J. Pearce. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2065268.)Elijah Martin Watkins appearing for Defendant Darigold, Inc.. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (Watkins, Elijah)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Joint Litigation Plan must be filed 14 calendar days prior to the scheduling conference. At least 21 calendar days before the scheduling conference is held, the parties shall confer and attempt to agree upon a discovery plan and shall discuss the merits of mediation or other alternative dispute resolution options with their clients and each other. (Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2020 10:00 AM before Judge William B. Shubb.). Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 9, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Shubb. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00224-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Darigold, Inc. and counsel for Zackery King re #1 Complaint and #4 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/7/2020. (jd)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Darigold, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Northwest Dairy Association for Darigold, Inc.. (Watkins, Elijah)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Darigold, Inc..(Watkins, Elijah)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zackery King. Darigold, Inc. served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Brown, Christopher)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Darigold, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darigold, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2046930.), filed by Zackery King. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Brown, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Darigold, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zackery King
Represented By: Jeremiah Matthew Hudson
Represented By: Christopher F Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darigold, Inc.
Represented By: Dexter J. Pearce
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?