Gietzen Solar, LLC v. Powerco Solar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gietzen Solar, LLC
Defendant: James Conder, Cody Cole, Taylor Byington and Powerco Solar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00292
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2020 Filing 14 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Taylor Byington, James Conder. Replies due by 8/14/2020.(Tejeda, Engels)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Against James Conder and Taylor Byington] filed by Taylor Byington, James Conder.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/27/2020.(Tejeda, Engels)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Against James Conder and Taylor Byington] OBJECTION filed by Gietzen Solar, LLC. Replies due by 7/24/2020.(Beorchia, Romeo)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gietzen Solar, LLC. (Beorchia, Romeo)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Romeo Kade Beorchia appearing for Plaintiff Gietzen Solar, LLC. Responses due by 7/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Beorchia, Romeo)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Engels J Tejeda for Taylor Byington and James Conder. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Against James Conder and Taylor Byington] Robert A Faucher appearing for Defendants Taylor Byington, James Conder. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Faucher, Robert)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Engels J. Tejeda. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2065402.)Robert A Faucher appearing for Defendants Taylor Byington, James Conder. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (Faucher, Robert)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Service of Notice of Removal (Dkt. 1) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Taylor Byington, James Conder . (Faucher, Robert)
June 15, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Taylor Byington, James Conder, and Gietzen Solar, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/14/2020. (ckh)
June 12, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Taylor Byington served on 6/12/2020; James Conder served on 6/12/2020. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ckh)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Taylor Byington, James Conder. (Faucher, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Taylor Byington, James Conder from Fifth Judicial District Court, County of Twin Falls, case number CV42-20-1635.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2061423.), filed by Taylor Byington, James Conder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Verified Complaint)(Faucher, Robert) Modified on 6/15/2020 to update exhibit descriptions (ckh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gietzen Solar, LLC v. Powerco Solar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Conder
Represented By: Robert A Faucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Byington
Represented By: Robert A Faucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerco Solar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gietzen Solar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?