Hoak v. Commission for Pardons and Parole, et al.
Plaintiff: Larry M. Hoak
Defendant: Shelly Williams, Commission for Pardons and Parole, One Unknowen Individual, Patrick, Al Ramerize, Ryan Kinney and Candy Dale
Case Number: 1:2020cv00299
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Larry M. Hoak. Responses due by 9/3/2020. (jd)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Larry M. Hoak. (Notice sent to Finance). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) (Order mailed to Josh Tewalt, Director IDOC Attn: Inmate Accounts 1299 N. Orchard, Suite 110 Boise, ID 83706)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Noncompliance - Amended Complaint due by 8/14/2020. (jd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY Motion to ORDER denying in forma pauperis application by Larry M. Hoak re #7 Order. (jd)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 VACATED - ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION - Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Dkt. #4 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the filing fee of $400.00 or present facts showing that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. If Plaintiff does not pay the fee and fails to establish imminent danger, the Court will dismiss this case without further notice. If Plaintiff establishes imminent danger, the Court will reconsider the Application. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (Order emailed to Finance) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) Modified on 8/7/2020 see order dkt. 10 (jd).
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry M. Hoak. (Attachments: #1 Offender Account Activity)(kt)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for the Court to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Larry M. Hoak. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (kt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Larry M. Hoak. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-34)(kt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Larry M. Hoak. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoak v. Commission for Pardons and Parole, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry M. Hoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commission for Pardons and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Unknowen Individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Ramerize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?