Hill v. Saul
Plaintiff: Machelle Hill
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00357
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob P Phillips on behalf of Andrew Saul (Phillips, Jacob)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Andrew Saul (Rodriguez, Joanne)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Machelle Hill re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/12/2020. (jp)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Machelle Hill This is a sealed document.. (Harper, Barbara)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2077780.), filed by Machelle Hill. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Harper, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machelle Hill
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?