Olson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jeremy Olson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Petitioner: Jeremy D. Olson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00403
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Andrew Saul (Rodriguez, Joanne)
September 11, 2020 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt # IDX26821 Paid in Full (ch)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED. Petitioner will be required to pay the filing fee of $400.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to be allowed to proceed. If he fails to pay the filing fee, the case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jd)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jeremy D. Olson, Andrew Saul re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/8/2020. (jd)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Barbara F Harper appearing for Plaintiff Jeremy Olson. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (Harper, Barbara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Jeremy Olson This is a sealed document.. (Harper, Barbara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Jeremy Olson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Harper, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Olson
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremy D. Olson
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?