Ratcil v. RDK Corporation
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Ratcil
Defendant: RDK Corporation doing business as Shadow Trackers
Case Number: 1:2020cv00408
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by RDK Corporation.(Schwartz, Andrew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenneth E. Ratcil. (Smith, Barkley)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RDK Corporation. RDK Corporation waiver sent on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Schwartz, Andrew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RDK Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for RDK Corporation. (Schwartz, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for RDK Corporation, Kenneth E. Ratcil re 5 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/16/2020. (jp)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #4 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Andrew Michael Schwartz for RDK Corporation. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrew Michael Schwartz. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2101695.)David W Lloyd appearing for Defendant RDK Corporation. Responses due by 10/6/2020 (Lloyd, David)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2020 09:30 AM in Other before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 10/21/20, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RDK Corporation. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RDK CORPORATION d/b/a Shadow Trackers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2090317.), filed by Kenneth E. Ratcil. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Smith, Barkley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratcil v. RDK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDK Corporation doing business as Shadow Trackers
Represented By: Andrew Michael Schwartz
Represented By: David W Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Ratcil
Represented By: Barkley Bissell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?