Midas Gold, Inc., et al. v. United States of America, et al.
Plaintiff: Stibnite Gold Company, Midas Gold, Inc. and Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen, Sonny Perdue, The United States Forest Service, The United States of America and U.S. Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 1:2020cv00409
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midas Gold, Inc., Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Stibnite Gold Company. Sonny Perdue served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; The United States Forest Service served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; The United States of America served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; U.S. Department of Agriculture served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Vicki Christiansen served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - USA (Dist of Idaho), #2 Proof of Service - USDA, #3 Proof of Service - Sonny Perdue, #4 Proof of Service - USFS, #5 Proof of Service - Vicki Christiansen)(Carter, Preston)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants.(Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 U.S. Department of Agriculture, #2 U.S. Forest Service, #3 Sonny Perdue, #4 Vicki Christiansen)(jd)
August 18, 2020 RECEIPT: pay.gov Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 0976-2090454. (jd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Summons Sonny Perdue, #8 Summons U.S. Department of Agriculture, #9 Summons U.S. Forest Service, #10 Summons U.S.A., #11 Summons Vicki Christiansen, #12 Cover Sheet)(jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midas Gold, Inc., et al. v. United States of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stibnite Gold Company
Represented By: Christopher H Meyer
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midas Gold, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher H Meyer
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC
Represented By: Christopher H Meyer
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?