Huff v. Idaho State Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: William James Huff
Defendant: Idaho State Correctional Center, Joshua Rankins and Jay Christensen
Case Number: 1:2020cv00421
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (contained in the Complaint) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint to correct the deficiencies set forth above, together with a motion to amend, no later than 30 days after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR INITIAL AND CONTINUING PAYMENTS FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William James Huff (Notice sent to Finance). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Director of the Idaho Department of Correction or his designee shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350.00 balance of the filing fee and shall forward payments to the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Joshua Rankins and Warden Christensen on August 21, 2020 by William James Huff. Waiver of Service due by 9/21/2020. (kt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William James Huff.(kt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William James Huff. (Attachments: #1 Offender Account Activity)(kt) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct date filed (kt).
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William James Huff. Responses due by 9/14/2020 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huff v. Idaho State Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho State Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Rankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William James Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?