Levi v. Doe, et al.
Plaintiff: Kandler Levi and Zackariah Levi Kandler
Defendant: John and Jane Does 2-10 and I John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00424
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff has 28 days to (1) submit a trust account statement as described above, or (2) pay the $400.00 filing fee. If Plaintiff does neither, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Zackariah Levi Kandler re: #4 Order of Conditional Filing, do not have a current address for Mr. Kandler. (jd)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Zackariah Levi Kandler, was released from jail, resent to new address provided by jail. New address has been updated. (jd)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Kandler Levi. (Resent to Mr. Levi using correct name and address.) (jd)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kandler Levi.(kt)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kandler Levi. (kt)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kandler Levi. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levi v. Doe, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandler Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zackariah Levi Kandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?