Mardanghomi v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shahriyar Mardanghomi
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00425
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Andrew Saul (Rodriguez, Joanne)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #3 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Social Security Number by Shahriyar Mardanghomi This is a sealed document.. (Harper, Barbara)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Shahriyar Mardanghomi re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/17/2020. (ckh)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (ckh)
August 27, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #2 Statement of Social Security Number filed by Shahriyar Mardanghomi was filed incorrectly in this case. The form must contain the case number and be signed and dated by the Petitioner. The filing party shall please re-submit their correct filing. (ckh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Barbara F Harper appearing for Plaintiff Shahriyar Mardanghomi. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (Harper, Barbara)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Shahriyar Mardanghomi This is a sealed document.. (Harper, Barbara)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Shahriyar Mardanghomi. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Harper, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mardanghomi v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahriyar Mardanghomi
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?