Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois v. LSP Products Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Defendant: LSP Products Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00436
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LSP Products Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LSP Products Group, Inc. for LSP Products Group, Inc.. (Nicholson, Chad)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Ann Kreimeyer on behalf of LSP Products Group, Inc. (Kreimeyer, Brittany)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for LSP Products Group, Inc., Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois re #6 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/21/2020. (alw)
October 22, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant LSP Products Group Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LSP Products Group, Inc..(Nicholson, Chad)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement filed byJason R N Monteleone on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Monteleone, Jason)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. LSP Products Group, Inc. served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Monteleone, Jason)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Plaintiff's Counsel shall refer to Local Rule 4.1 (lc)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LSP Products Group, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LSP Products Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2100997.), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Monteleone, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois v. LSP Products Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSP Products Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brittany Ann Kreimeyer
Represented By: Chad Matthew Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?