Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Travis Wayne Thomas
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00442
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons for Commissioner of Social Security, #2 Summons for Civil Process Clerk)(jd)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION - IT IS THEREFORE HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) Order emailed to finance dept.
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Travis Wayne Thomas re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/13/2020. (ckh)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing (ckh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Travis Wayne Thomas This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Brad D Parkinson appearing for Petitioner Travis Wayne Thomas. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Parkinson, Brad)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Travis Wayne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Parkinson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travis Wayne Thomas
Represented By: Brad D Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?