Gleason v. Bernhardt
Plaintiff: Karen Miranda Gleason
Defendant: David L. Bernhardt
Case Number: 1:2020cv00474
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER adopting #20 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing for the extension, Plaintiff's deadline to respond to #17 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is now January 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (kcs)
December 4, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Karen Miranda Gleason. (Coulter, Ronaldo)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance for Ronald A. Coulter Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 26, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Alan Lescht. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2134016.)Ronaldo Arthur Coulter appearing for Plaintiff Karen Miranda Gleason. Responses due by 12/17/2020 (Coulter, Ronaldo)
November 20, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Peter L Wucetich appearing for Defendant David L. Bernhardt. Responses due by 12/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wucetich, Peter)
November 5, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: All Defendants. (jd)
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for David L. Bernhardt, Karen Miranda Gleason re #1 Complaint, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/4/2021. (jd)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER adopting #14 Stipulation. Consistent with the parties' agreement as described in the Stipulation, Defendant's response to #1 Complaint is now due November 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (kcs)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by David L. Bernhardt. (Wucetich, Peter)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter L Wucetich on behalf of David L. Bernhardt (Wucetich, Peter)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of David L. Bernhardt (Rodriguez, Joanne)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 All out of state counsel continuing representation need to obtain local counsel and file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. Please see Local Rule, Civil Rule 83.4 Bar Admission) Pro Hac Vice/Local Counsel and ECF Procedures 3. Registration, Logins and Passwords. B. Limited Registered Participants.1. (jd)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-01559. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Consent Motion to Transfer and Motion for Extension of Defendant's Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. This case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Idaho. Defendant shall have thirty days, or such other time as set by the transferee court, from the date after this case is placed on the electronic docket for the transferee court to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/8/2020. (lcapm1)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DAVID L. BERNHARDT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha)
September 3, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #5 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with correct event/party served. (eg)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID L. BERNHARDT served on 7/16/2020 (Rolston, Rani)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/20/2020. (Rolston, Rani) Modified serve date on 8/28/2020 (eg).
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 7/10/2020. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 7/31/2020. (Rolston, Rani) Modified on 9/3/2020 (eg).
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of DAVID L. BERNHARDT (Yee, Marsha)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DAVID L. BERNHARDT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
June 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA Correcting Complaint by KAREN MIRANDA GLEASON #1 Complaint, filed by KAREN MIRANDA GLEASON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Complaint)(Rolston, Rani)
June 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID L. BERNHARDT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7226963) filed by KAREN MIRANDA GLEASON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Agency Head, #3 Summons US Attorney General, #4 Summons US Attorney for DC)(Rolston, Rani)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gleason v. Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Miranda Gleason
Represented By: Rani V. Rolston
Represented By: Ronaldo Arthur Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Bernhardt
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Represented By: Peter L Wucetich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?