Jackson et al v. Twin Falls City et al
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jackson and Jason Harmon
Defendant: Twin Falls County, Idaho Dept of Corections, State of Idaho and Twin Falls City
Case Number: 1:2020cv00485
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jd)
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 12/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Affidavit in Support)(kt)
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 EMERGENCY Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Affidavit)(kt)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION Letter to Presiding Judge by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 12/21/2020. (jd)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter)(jd)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF SEVERANCE. IT IS ORDERED: The Clerk of Court is directed to SEVER the claims of Jason Harmon into a new civil rights action. Plaintiff Jason Harmon is TERMINATED as a party to this action, which will proceed with Michael E. Jackson as the only Plaintiff. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND WITHDRAWAL OF INMATE FILING FEE FROM PLAINTIFF HARMON'S JAIL TRUST ACCOUNT re #7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason Harmon (Notice sent to Finance). IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff Harmon's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED. The Sheriff of Twin Falls County or a designee will collect from Plaintiff Harmon's inmate trust account his $175.00 portion of filing fee and will forward payments to the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR IN PAUPERIS STATUS AND WITHDRAWAL OF INMATE FILING FEE FROM PLAINTIFF JACKSON'S JAIL TRUST ACCOUNT re #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael E. Jackson (Notice sent to Finance). IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff Jackson's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #3 ) is GRANTED. The Sheriff of Twin Falls County or a designee will collect from Plaintiff Jackson's inmate trust account his $175.00 portion of filing fee and will forward payments to the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account by Jason Harmon. This is a sealed document. (ckh)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jason Harmon. Responses due by 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (ckh)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF HARMON. IT IS ORDERED: Within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff Harmon must either pay his $200 portion of the filing fee in full or apply for in forma pauperis status. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Special Master Rule 53, F. R. Civ. Proc. by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Appointment of Special Master, #2 Envelope) (ckh)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account by Michael E. Jackson. This is a sealed document. (ckh)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael E. Jackson. Responses due by 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (ckh)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Twin Falls City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Falls County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Dept of Corections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Falls City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?