Shupe et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Grant T. Shupe, Janice K. Shupe, Chad B. Shupe, Keith G. Shupe, Stanley Enterprises, LLC, Heidi Shupe, Owen K. Shupe Trust, Karl M. Shupe, Paul B. Shupe, Stephen Shupe and Trustee Keith Shupe
Defendant: United States Forest Service, United States Department of Agriculture and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00561
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR STAY. The Joint Motion to Stay (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. The above-captioned action is stayed through May 13, 2021. The Parties will update the Court as to their progress in resolving the litigation on or before May 13, 2021. If the Parties inform the Court that negotiations are no longer fruitful and that the stay should not be extended, Defendants Answer will be filed by June 14, 2021. In the event the litigation progresses, the parties shall be prepared to discuss with the Court the merits of consolidating the instant action with other, similar actions now before U.S. Magistrate Judge Candy Dale. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Christine Gealy England appearing for Defendants United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service, United States of America. Responses due by 2/22/2021 (England, Christine)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heidi Shupe, Keith G. Shupe, Stephen Shupe, Owen K. Shupe Trust, Chad B. Shupe, Janice K. Shupe, Keith Shupe, Stanley Enterprises, LLC, Paul B. Shupe, Karl M. Shupe, Grant T. Shupe. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - USA (District of Idaho), #2 Affidavit of Service - USDA, #3 Affidavit of Service - USFS)(Carter, Preston)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Department of Agriculture, #2 Summons U.S. Forest Service)(kt)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jeffrey W Appel for Owen K. Shupe Trust,Jeffrey W Appel for Chad B. Shupe,Jeffrey W Appel for Grant T. Shupe,Jeffrey W Appel for Heidi Shupe,Jeffrey W Appel for Janice K. Shupe,Jeffrey W Appel for Karl M. Shupe,Jeffrey W Appel for Keith Shupe,Jeffrey W Appel for Keith G. Shupe,Jeffrey W Appel for Paul B. Shupe,Jeffrey W Appel for Stephen Shupe,Jeffrey W Appel for Stanley Enterprises, LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeffrey W. Appel. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2140282.)Preston N Carter appearing for Plaintiffs Owen K. Shupe Trust, Chad B. Shupe, Grant T. Shupe, Heidi Shupe, Janice K. Shupe, Karl M. Shupe, Keith Shupe, Keith G. Shupe, Paul B. Shupe, Stephen Shupe, Stanley Enterprises, LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Carter, Preston)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Quiet Title against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0976-2139943.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B to Complaint, #2 Exhibits C - D to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - USA, #5 Summons - USDA, #6 Summons - USFS)(Carter, Preston)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shupe et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant T. Shupe
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice K. Shupe
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad B. Shupe
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith G. Shupe
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Shupe
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen K. Shupe Trust
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl M. Shupe
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul B. Shupe
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Shupe
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Keith Shupe
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey W Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?