Brizendine v. Tristar Products, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Darla Brizendine
Defendant: Tristar Products, Inc. and John Does 1-100 or John Doe Corporation I-IV
Case Number: 1:2020cv00586
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Claire R Kelly
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2021. ADR must be held by 7/16/2021. Discovery due by 9/15/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 4/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2021. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/26/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Claire R Kelly.). Signed by Judge Claire R Kelly. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 19, 2021 Filing 20 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire R Kelly: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/19/2021. Appearances: Plaintiff's counsel Ms. Heather Cover, Ms. Michelle Hyer and Mr. Mark R. Wasden and Defense counsel Mr. Joshua S. Evett. Audio File saved through AT&T conference line. (st)
February 16, 2021 Filing 19 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Darla Brizendine. (Hyer, Michelle)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 DISCOVERY PLAN by Darla Brizendine . (Hyer, Michelle)
February 11, 2021 Filing 17 Tristar ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Darla Brizendine by Tristar Products, Inc..(Evett, Joshua)
February 2, 2021 Filing 16 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Heather Cover for Darla Brizendine Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Heather M. Cover. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2161376.)Michelle Hyer appearing for Plaintiff Darla Brizendine. Responses due by 2/22/2021 (Hyer, Michelle)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Michelle Hyer for Darla Brizendine Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 29, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 11 EX PARTE MOTION filed by Darla Brizendine was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-submit their filing under the correct event of motion for pro hac.(alw)
January 28, 2021 Filing 12 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michelle Hyer. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2159780.)Mark R Wasden appearing for Plaintiff Darla Brizendine. Responses due by 2/18/2021 (Wasden, Mark)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Stipulation to Extend Deadlines (ECF No. #8 ) isGRANTED and the parties have until Tuesday, February 16, 2021 to file their joint litigation plan and discovery plan, and the telephonic status conference is set for Friday, February 19, 2021 at 9:00 AM mountain standard time. Signed by Judge Claire R Kelly. (alw)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines by Tristar Products, Inc.. (Evett, Joshua)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Darla Brizendine, Tristar Products, Inc. re #6 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/29/2021. (alw)
January 27, 2021 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S Evett on behalf of Tristar Products, Inc. (Evett, Joshua)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2021 09:00 AM in Other before Judge Claire R Kelly. On or before February 1, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Claire R Kelly. (alw)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Claire R Kelly from the U.S. Court of International Trade. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 14, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Claire Kelly. Please use case number 1:20-cv-586-CRK on all future pleadings. (st)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darla Brizendine. Tristar Products, Inc. served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Wasden, Mark)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tristar Products, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tristar Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0976-2144461.), filed by Darla Brizendine. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Wasden, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brizendine v. Tristar Products, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Products, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua S Evett
Represented By: Mallam John Prior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100 or John Doe Corporation I-IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Brizendine
Represented By: Mark R Wasden
Represented By: Michelle Hyer
Represented By: Heather Cover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?