PLC Trenching Co., LLC v. IM Services Group, LLC
Plaintiff: PLC Trenching Co., LLC
Defendant: IM Services Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00602
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant IM Services Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Donahey, Teague)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to John Arthur Bauer re: 16 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance(alw)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. #15 ) is GRANTED. Defendants response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #1 ) is due on or before April 26, 2021. Plaintiffs reply is due on or before May 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 4/26/2021 Replies due by 5/17/2021. (alw)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by IM Services Group, LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donahey, Teague)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PLC Trenching Co., LLC. Replies due by 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Cuneo in Support of Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Extension of Time, #2 Exhibit A - Docket Report (Amazon.com, Inc. v. Barnesandnoble.com, Inc. et al.))(Cuneo, Christopher)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #12 #13 #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney John Arthur Bauer, Lloyd G Farr, Ashley Boland Summer for IM Services Group, LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant IM Services Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Donahey, Teague)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Ashley Boland Summer. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2157123.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant IM Services Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/12/2021 (Donahey, Teague)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Lloyd G. Farr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2157122.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant IM Services Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/12/2021 (Donahey, Teague)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John Arthur Bauer. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2157116.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Defendant IM Services Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/12/2021 (Donahey, Teague)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IM Services Group, LLC. (Donahey, Teague)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before February 25, 2021; Defendants Motion for Extension of Time must be filed on or before January 25, 2021; Plaintiffs response to the Motion for Extension of Time is due on or before January 29, 2021; Defendants reply brief to the Motion on or before February 2, 2021; and The January 26, 2021 deadline for Defendant to file a response to the Preliminary Injunction Motion is VACATED pending resolution of the forthcoming motion for extension of time, wherein the Court will set forth the response deadlines. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. ((alw)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for IM Services Group, LLC, PLC Trenching Co., LLC re #7 Notice of Appearance, #2 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/22/2021. (alw)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by IM Services Group, LLC. (Donahey, Teague)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Teague Ian Donahey on behalf of IM Services Group, LLC (Donahey, Teague)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLC Trenching Co., LLC. IM Services Group, LLC served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. (Herberholz, Dana)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)6,981,342; 7,310,896 (Notice sent to USPTO) (alw)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to IM Services Group, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PLC Trenching Co., LLC. (Herberholz, Dana)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against IM Services Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0976-2147155.), filed by PLC Trenching Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Herberholz, Dana)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Dana M Herberholz appearing for Plaintiff PLC Trenching Co., LLC. Responses due by 1/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Dana Herberholz, #3 Affidavit of David Critelli, #4 Affidavit of Richard Rohde)(Herberholz, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLC Trenching Co., LLC v. IM Services Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IM Services Group, LLC
Represented By: B Newal Squyres
Represented By: John Arthur Bauer
Represented By: Ashley Boland Summer
Represented By: Lloyd G Farr
Represented By: Teague Ian Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLC Trenching Co., LLC
Represented By: Dana M Herberholz
Represented By: Jordan Lee Stott
Represented By: Alexandra Hodson
Represented By: Christopher J Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?