Selene et al v. Legislature of the State of Idaho, The et al
Plaintiff: Kassie Howe, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Ahniah Selene, Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc. and Life, A Center for Independent Living
Defendant: Chuck Winder, Scott Bedke, Legislature of the State of Idaho, The and Legislature of the State of Idaho
Case Number: 1:2021cv00021
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO ENTER CONSENT DECREE.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion is GRANTED and the Consent Decree entered in the form so stipulated. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt) Modified docket text to match caption of order on 3/5/2021 (kt).
March 4, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION to Enter Consent Decree by Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene. (Olson, Wendy)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants are granted a fourteen (14) day extension of time in which to file a responsive pleading, up through and until March 16, 2021. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
March 2, 2021 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Elijah Martin Watkins appearing for Plaintiffs Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene. Responses due by 3/23/2021 (Watkins, Elijah)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants are granted a fourteen (14) day extension of time in which to file a responsive pleading, up through and until March 2, 2021. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
February 16, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION re #25 Summons Returned Executed, Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time by Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene. (Olson, Wendy)
January 26, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Life, A Center for Independent Living, Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Kassie Howe, Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Ahniah Selene, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho. Scott Bedke served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021; Legislature of the State of Idaho served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021; Chuck Winder served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Olson, Wendy)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #2 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
January 22, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Scott Bedke, Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Legislature of the State of Idaho, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene, Chuck Winder. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/23/2021. (kt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Scott Bedke re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, a Preliminary Injunction, #18 Response to Motion, filed by Scott Bedke, Legislature of the State of Idaho, Chuck Winder (Second Declaration of Scott Bedke). (Bennett, A.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Wendy J. Olson re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, a Preliminary Injunction filed by Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Olson Decl)(Olson, Wendy)
January 15, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, a Preliminary Injunction filed by Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wendy Olson, #2 Exhibit A to Olson Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Olson Decl, #4 Exhibit C to Olson Decl, #5 Exhibit D to Olson Decl)(Olson, Wendy)
January 14, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, a Preliminary Injunction (Watkins, Elijah)
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, a Preliminary Injunction filed by Scott Bedke, Legislature of the State of Idaho, Chuck Winder. Replies due by 1/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Milstead, #2 Declaration of Chuck Winder, #3 Declaration of Norma Clark, #4 Declaration of Scott Bedke)(Bennett, A.)
January 13, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of David C. Pate, M.D., J.D. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, a Preliminary Injunction filed by Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Pate Decl, #2 Exhibit B to Pate Decl)(Olson, Wendy)
January 13, 2021 Filing 16 ERRATA by Plaintiffs Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene re #1 Complaint, Exhibit B (Dkt 1-2). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Olson, Wendy)
January 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Scott Bedke, Legislature of the State of Idaho, The, Chuck Winder re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, a Preliminary Injunction Notice of Intent to Respond and Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, a Preliminary Injunction (Bennett, A.)
January 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Dean Bennett on behalf of All Defendants (Bennett, A.)
January 12, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #8 , #9 , #11 , #12 , and #13 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Seth Wayne, Jennifer Safstrom, Annie L Owens, Amy L Marshak, & Mary B McCord for all Plaintiffs. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Seth Wayne. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2152085.)Wendy Olson appearing for Plaintiffs Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene. Responses due by 2/1/2021 (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jennifer Safstrom. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2152079.)Wendy Olson appearing for Plaintiffs Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene. Responses due by 2/1/2021 (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Annie L. Owens. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2152076.)Wendy Olson appearing for Plaintiffs Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene. Responses due by 2/1/2021 (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Scott Bedke, Legislature of the State of Idaho, The, Chuck Winder. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Amy L. Marshak. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2152069.)Wendy Olson appearing for Plaintiffs Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene. Responses due by 2/1/2021 (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Mary B. McCord. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2152063.)Wendy Olson appearing for Plaintiffs Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Life, A Center for Independent Living, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene. Responses due by 2/1/2021 (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intermountain Fair Housing Council. (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A Center for Independent Living. (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho. (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Disability Rights Idaho, Inc.. (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc.. (Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, a Preliminary Injunction Wendy Olson appearing for Plaintiffs A Center for Independent Living, Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc., Disability Rights Idaho, Inc., Kassie Howe, Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho, Ahniah Selene. Responses due by 2/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Ahniah Selene, #3 Declaration of Kassie Howe, #4 Declaration of Mark Leeper, #5 Declaration of Amy Cunningham, #6 Declaration of Jeremy Maxand, #7 Declaration of Heather Clarke, #8 Declaration of Zoe Ann Olson)(Olson, Wendy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0976-2152009.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Olson, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selene et al v. Legislature of the State of Idaho, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassie Howe
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Represented By: Jennifer Safstrom
Represented By: Annie L Owens
Represented By: Mary Beth McCord
Represented By: Amy L Marshak
Represented By: Seth Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Living Independence Network Corporation Idaho
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Represented By: Jennifer Safstrom
Represented By: Annie L Owens
Represented By: Mary Beth McCord
Represented By: Amy L Marshak
Represented By: Seth Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intermountain Fair Housing Council
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Represented By: Jennifer Safstrom
Represented By: Annie L Owens
Represented By: Mary Beth McCord
Represented By: Amy L Marshak
Represented By: Seth Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahniah Selene
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Represented By: Jennifer Safstrom
Represented By: Annie L Owens
Represented By: Mary Beth McCord
Represented By: Amy L Marshak
Represented By: Seth Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disability Rights Idaho, Inc.
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Represented By: Jennifer Safstrom
Represented By: Annie L Owens
Represented By: Mary Beth McCord
Represented By: Amy L Marshak
Represented By: Seth Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disability Action Center - Northwest, Inc.
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Represented By: Jennifer Safstrom
Represented By: Annie L Owens
Represented By: Mary Beth McCord
Represented By: Amy L Marshak
Represented By: Seth Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life, A Center for Independent Living
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Represented By: Jennifer Safstrom
Represented By: Annie L Owens
Represented By: Mary Beth McCord
Represented By: Amy L Marshak
Represented By: Seth Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Winder
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bedke
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legislature of the State of Idaho, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legislature of the State of Idaho
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?