Reeder v. LG Chem Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Tucker Geroge Reeder
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00032
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STAYING CASE. This action is hereby stayed for 90 days pending the outcome of the conditional settlement. The Court will hold a status conference with the Parties on May 17, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. Mountain Time. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
February 18, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stay Proceedings by Tucker Geroge Reeder. (May, James)
February 10, 2021 Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #15 #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance for Kenneth W Pearson, Adam J Kress. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kenneth W. Pearson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2165374.)James Justin May appearing for Plaintiff Tucker Geroge Reeder. Responses due by 3/2/2021 (May, James)
February 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Adam J. Kress. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2165365.)James Justin May appearing for Plaintiff Tucker Geroge Reeder. Responses due by 3/2/2021 (May, James)
February 3, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #13 Reply to Response to Motion filed by LG Chem America, Inc. was filed with the incorrect attachment. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing using the event "errata".(kt)
February 2, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LG Chem Ltd..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kirkham, Kelsie)
February 2, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LG Chem America, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kirkham, Kelsie)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance for George S Pitcher Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 27, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:21-cv-32-BLW (alw)
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(alw)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2158593.)( Responses due by 2/16/2021)Kelsie Kirkham appearing for Defendants LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd.. (Kirkham, Kelsie) Modified on 1/27/2021 to remove fee waiver language(alw).
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd., Tucker Geroge Reeder re #1 Notice of Removal Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/23/2021. (alw)
January 22, 2021 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Southern Division and case reassigned to Judge Bush. Please use case number 1:21-cv-32-REB for all future filings. (alw)
January 22, 2021 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - LG Chem America, Inc. served on 1/19/2021; LG Chem Ltd. served on 1/19/2021. (alw)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Kelsie A. Kirkham re #1 Notice of Removal filed by John Does 1-10, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Summons and State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Dismissal of Vape Castle, #3 Miscellaneous State Court Docs, #4 State Court Docket)(Kirkham, Kelsie) Modified on 1/22/2021 (alw).
January 21, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #5 Declaration filed by John Does 1-10, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd. was filed incorrectly in this case. Each state court document shall be individual attachments. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing.(alw)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Kelsie Kirkham appearing for Defendant LG Chem Ltd.. Responses due by 2/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Plaintiff's Response to Motion, #4 Declaration in Support of Response)(alw)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Kelsie Kirkham appearing for Defendant LG Chem America, Inc.. Responses due by 2/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Plaintiff's Response to Motion, #4 Declaration in Support of Response)(alw)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Kelsie A. Kirkham re #1 Notice of Removal filed by John Does 1-10, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Kirkham, Kelsie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal filed by John Does 1-10, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Kirkham, Kelsie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Does 1-10, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd.. (Kirkham, Kelsie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Does 1-10, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd.. (Kirkham, Kelsie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Third Judicial District, County of Canyon, case number XC14-20-07228.(Filing fee $402 receipt number0976-2155365.), filed by All Defendants.(Kirkham, Kelsie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeder v. LG Chem Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsie Kirkham
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem Ltd.
Represented By: Kelsie Kirkham
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Kelsie Kirkham
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tucker Geroge Reeder
Represented By: James Justin May
Represented By: MIchael K. Johnson
Represented By: Kenneth W. Pearson
Represented By: Adam J. Kress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?